Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/27/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/27/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/12/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/18/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/18/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/25/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/05/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/14/2002