Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/20/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/16/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/16/2001