Refine your search

Date Major Actions
07/16/2002 Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Baucus with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-211.
07/19/2001 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 198 (Roll no. 254).
07/16/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-138, Part II.
07/12/2001 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-138, Part I.
03/29/2001 Introduced in House