Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/14/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/15/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/21/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/21/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/04/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/04/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/26/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/08/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/12/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/12/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/26/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/10/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/10/2001