Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/05/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/21/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/21/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/06/2001