Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/04/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-321.
12/04/2002 Signed by President.
11/22/2002 Presented to President.
11/15/2002 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR 11/14/2002 H8925-9007; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 11/14/2002 H8994-8996)
11/14/2002 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7043-7046)
09/26/2002 Introduced in House