Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/26/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/02/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/09/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/21/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/21/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/12/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/12/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/22/2002