Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/18/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/18/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/18/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/02/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/02/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/02/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/13/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/14/2002