Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 09/05/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/05/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/10/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/10/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/10/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/11/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/11/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/11/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/11/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/11/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/12/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/12/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/18/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/18/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/18/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/18/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/19/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/19/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/23/2002