Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/10/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/19/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/25/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/07/2002