Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 07/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/04/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/09/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/02/2002