Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/04/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/04/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/13/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/13/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/13/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/13/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/13/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/23/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/23/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/24/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/24/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/26/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/30/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/30/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/30/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/14/2002