Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/08/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/08/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/08/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/08/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/08/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/08/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/08/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/08/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/08/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/08/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/08/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/08/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/08/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/08/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/08/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/08/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/16/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/16/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/24/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2002