Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/26/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/26/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/24/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/24/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/02/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/16/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/13/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/13/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/13/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/13/2002