Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/18/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/25/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/16/2002