Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/14/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/06/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/06/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/06/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/14/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/14/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/14/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/19/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/22/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/22/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/29/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/06/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/13/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/25/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/25/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/25/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/25/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/11/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/16/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/16/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/31/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/05/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/24/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/09/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/10/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/12/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/06/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/13/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/13/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/19/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/16/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/16/2002