Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/10/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/17/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/23/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/23/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/24/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/30/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/30/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/01/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/03/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/28/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/13/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/14/2002