Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/11/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/11/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/11/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/11/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/11/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/11/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/11/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/11/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/15/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/15/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/15/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/16/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/16/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/16/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/17/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/17/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/17/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/18/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/23/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/23/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/13/2002