Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/19/2002