Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/09/2002
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/09/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/09/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/09/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/09/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/11/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/11/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/11/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/11/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/11/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/12/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/12/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/12/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/12/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/15/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/15/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/15/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/17/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/17/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/17/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/17/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/18/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/22/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/25/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/25/2002