Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/28/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/28/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/28/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/14/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/14/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/14/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/14/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/14/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/25/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/09/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/25/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/25/2001