Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/16/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/21/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/22/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/05/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/06/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/12/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/12/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/17/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/23/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/23/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/26/2002