Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2002