Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/27/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/01/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2002