Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/15/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/15/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/04/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/11/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/09/2002