Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/20/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/20/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/20/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/10/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/10/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/05/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/09/2002