Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/11/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2002