Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/25/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/2002