Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/30/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/09/2002