Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/11/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/11/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/11/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/23/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/08/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew