Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/09/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/09/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/09/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/23/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/13/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/15/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/15/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/15/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/16/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/16/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/13/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/13/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/2002