Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/17/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/17/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/17/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/17/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/17/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/17/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/17/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/17/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/17/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/17/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/17/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/17/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/17/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/17/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/29/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/29/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 04/29/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/07/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/07/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/07/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/07/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/07/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/07/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/09/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/09/2002