Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/20/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/02/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/07/2002