Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/08/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/15/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/27/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/28/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/05/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 12/12/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/05/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/09/2002