Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/14/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/14/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/14/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/28/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/14/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/14/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/29/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/06/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/25/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/28/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/28/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/28/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/28/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/28/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/13/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/13/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/13/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/20/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/13/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/19/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/16/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/17/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew