Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/19/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/04/2002