Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/12/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/13/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/20/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/16/2002