Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/07/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/13/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/25/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/25/2002