Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/04/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/05/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/2002