Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/27/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/12/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/13/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/19/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/01/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/01/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/12/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/12/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/12/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/22/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/16/2002