Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/12/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/18/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/09/2002