Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/06/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/06/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/06/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/06/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/07/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/07/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/12/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/12/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/13/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/19/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/10/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2002