Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/08/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/12/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/12/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/05/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/12/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/19/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/19/2002