Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/16/2002