Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/23/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/13/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/26/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/06/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/10/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/01/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/01/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/09/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/21/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/18/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/18/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/18/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/10/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/26/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/05/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/11/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/11/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/11/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/12/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/12/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/12/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/17/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/07/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/13/2002