Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/13/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/23/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/23/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/14/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/09/2002