Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/25/2002