Refine your search

Date Major Actions
11/27/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-305.
11/27/2002 Signed by President.
11/15/2002 Presented to President.
11/12/2002 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H8067-8079; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8067-8070)
10/16/2002 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2182 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/16/2002 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/07/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 12 (Roll no. 13).(text as passed House: CR H211-213)
02/04/2002 Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
02/04/2002 Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 107-355, Part I.
12/04/2001 Introduced in House