Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/23/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/23/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/07/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/14/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/14/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/14/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/27/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/27/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/05/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/05/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/05/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/05/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/05/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/07/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/07/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/07/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/07/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/13/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/13/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 03/20/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/09/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/11/2002