Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/06/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/17/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/07/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/02/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/20/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/22/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/21/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/13/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/13/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/13/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/13/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/16/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/16/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/16/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/13/2002